+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 14, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0999)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Rec. of Gov's recommendation agreed to (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov. recomm. (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Title replaced
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB2048ER2)
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 999 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 26, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2048ER)
On February 18, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (72-Y 7-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (72-Y 7-N)
On February 17, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Sen. Mims agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 1999 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1999 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 1999 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 1999 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 991326487