+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Mitchell. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Barreto, McLane.
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on April 15, 2019 Calendar.
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Johnson. Adopted. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Hass, Heard, President Courtney, Wagner.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.