+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Kennemer. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Esquivel, Taylor.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2015 Calendar.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Dembrow. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-24 Calendar and placed on 02-26 Calendar by unanimous consent.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #2146
5/6/2013 2:46:30 PM
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor