+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution. Ayes, 30.
On June 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Greenlick. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone.
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Adopted. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-23 Calendar and placed on 03-02 Calendar on voice vote.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (6/5/2017 5:13:48 PM)
Amendment A3
Proposed (6/5/2017 5:13:48 PM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/15/2017 1:42:43 PM)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor