+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Post. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Clem, Huffman.
- Rules suspended to allow for immediate consideration.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, DeBoer, Thatcher.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor