+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Read. Carried by <
>. Adopted.Ayes, 60. - First reading.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Adopted.Ayes, 28; nays, 2--Knopp, Kruse.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Work Session held.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor