+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Barnhart. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boone, Meek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 5, 2017 Calendar.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Beyer. Adopted. Ayes, 30.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from 04-20 Calendar and placed on 05-03 Calendar on voice vote.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor