+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
- President signed.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Shields. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
- Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from 03-24 Calendar and placed on 04-06 Calendar on voice vote.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.