+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Boone. Adopted.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Gorsek, Keny-Guyer, McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor