+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On July 9, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Lininger, Olson. Adopted.Ayes, 44; Nays, 16--Barreto, Bentz, Clem, Esquivel, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett.
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli, Burdick. Adopted.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Hansell, Thomsen; excused, 1--Olsen.
- Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent.
- Baertschiger Jr, Thomsen, granted unanimous consent to change vote to nay.
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Implementing Measure 91.
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Taken from 06-29 Calendar and placed on 06-30 Calendar on voice vote.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral. Referred to Implementing Measure 91 by order of the President.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor