+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #1748
Not Adopted
Amendment #1747
Not Adopted
Amendment #1041
Not Adopted
Amendment #1746
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsors (45)
Type:
Primary Sponsor