+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Barreto, Kennemer. Adopted.Ayes, 50; Nays, 9--Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Krieger, Stark, Weidner, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 1--Rayfield.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2015 Calendar.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Work Session held.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor