+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On July 2, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Hoyle. Adopted.Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Barker, Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Vega Pederson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Williamson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Prozanski. Adopted.Ayes, 30.
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt and be referred to Rules by prior reference.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary, then Rules.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #2869
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor