+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Rayfield. Adopted. Ayes, 43; Nays, 11--Barker, Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Wilson.
On June 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Work Session held.
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Final reading. Carried by Golden. Adopted. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Hansell, Olsen, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
- Second reading.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments to the A-Eng. resolution (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
- Work Session held.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Campaign Finance.
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (11)
Amendment -B13
Proposed (6/29/2019 3:08 PM)
Amendment -A11
Adopted (6/17/2019 8:50 AM)
Amendment -B12
Proposed (6/29/2019 2:04 PM)
Amendment -A10
Proposed (5/31/2019 2:10 PM)
Amendment -8
Proposed (3/27/2019 9:42 AM)
Amendment -7
Proposed (3/25/2019 1:33 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (3/25/2019 4:43 PM)
Amendment -5
Adopted (3/25/2019 1:32 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (3/25/2019 1:33 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/20/2019 1:37 PM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (3/20/2019 1:37 PM)