+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Without recommendation as to adoption and be referred to Rules.
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Possible Work Session cancelled.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #3436
2/13/2014 12:19:08 PM
Amendment #3435
2/13/2014 12:19:08 PM
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor