+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and readopted Resolution.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Bates, Ferrioli, Shields, Winters.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Boone. Adopted.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Komp.
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Roblan. Adopted.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Johnson, Olsen, Winters.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/19/2016 2:17:14 PM)