+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Findley. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Boles, Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on May 22, 2019 Calendar.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Olsen.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.