+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Hack. Adopted. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Bentz, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Heard.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on June 22, 2017 Calendar.
On June 19, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 30.
- Made a Special Order of Business by unanimous consent.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Taken from 05-30 Calendar and placed on 06-01 Calendar on voice vote.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor