+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Wagner. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, President Courtney, Thomsen.
- Made a Special Order of Business by voice vote.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Taken from 03-11 Calendar and placed on 03-12 Calendar on voice vote.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (2/27/2019 8:45 AM)