+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Williamson. Adopted. Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 2--Hayden, Heard.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Final reading. Carried by Winters. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Work Session held.
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor