+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On March 8, 2020 in the House:
- At Desk upon adjournment.
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 8, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 4, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 5, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 4, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On March 2, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 3, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 28, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to March 2, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 28, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Carried over to February 27, 2020 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Riley, Frederick. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Gelser.
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt.
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.