+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read as Special Order of Business. Carried by Evans, Lewis. Adopted. Ayes, 60.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Made a Special Order of Business on March 2, 2018 Calendar.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Boquist. Adopted. Ayes, 24; Excused, 6--Gelser, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley.
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-12 Calendar and placed on 02-13 Calendar on voice vote.
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -4
Adopted (2/7/2018 6:13:23 PM)
Amendment -1
Combined (1/31/2018 4:25:14 PM)
Amendment -2
Combined (1/31/2018 4:25:14 PM)