+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Barton. Adopted.Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Smith; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger.
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to February 28, 2014 Calendar.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Edwards, excused when roll taken, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
- Final reading. Carried by Olsen. Adopted.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor