+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Malstrom. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Kruse.
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Taken from 02-15 Calendar and placed on 02-22 Calendar on voice vote.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Presession Released to the Public.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor