+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Boquist, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
- Final reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Adopted. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--Heard, Johnson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to refer to Rules carried by voice vote.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/20/2021 2:22 PM)