+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Zika, Kropf. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Knopp. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Heard.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (3/11/2021 8:07 AM)