+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 26, 2021 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On April 5, 2021 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Patterson. Adopted. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Heard.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do adopt.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.