+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed With Secretary of State.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Read. Carried by Zika. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Helm; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans.
On May 10, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Final reading. Carried by Johnson. Adopted. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Boquist, President Courtney, Thomsen.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Be adopted.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.