+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -8
Proposed (4/18/2017 9:42:08 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/14/2017 12:24:04 PM)
Amendment -4
Proposed (4/14/2017 12:24:04 PM)
Amendment -6
Proposed (4/17/2017 3:14:33 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/13/2017 1:03:09 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/14/2017 2:01:47 PM)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor