+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education, then Ways and Means.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/14/2017 8:31:32 AM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/3/2017 11:08:32 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/4/2017 8:20:39 AM)