+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 741, 2017 Laws.
On August 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hayden.
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On July 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On July 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr.
On July 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A4
Adopted (6/29/2017 3:47:15 PM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/17/2017 10:02:23 AM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/17/2017 8:24:02 AM)