+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 473, 2019 Laws.
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Olsen, Thomsen.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 48; Nays, 8--Barreto, Findley, Nearman, Post, Reschke, Smith G, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek, Sprenger.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A3
Adopted (5/21/2019 9:20 AM)
Amendment -A2
Proposed (5/20/2019 11:02 AM)
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/8/2019 1:45 PM)