+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, June 25, 2015.
- Chapter 590, 2015 Laws.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed.Ayes, 51; Excused, 3--Barton, Gallegos, Gorsek; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Bentz, Davis, Greenlick, McKeown, Vega Pederson, Speaker Kotek.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2015 Calendar.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rural Communities, Land Use, and Water.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Shields, Winters.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (5)
Amendment #
6/2/2015 8:33:24 AM
Amendment #7065
5/29/2015 10:51:05 AM
Amendment #7197
6/2/2015 8:33:24 AM
Amendment #6824
5/21/2015 10:00:28 AM
Amendment #6884
5/26/2015 9:01:52 AM