+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 489, 2017 Laws.
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 20, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist.
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Bentz, Piluso, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Alonso Leon, Hernandez.
On June 12, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar.
On June 7, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2017 Calendar.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2017 Calendar.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Johnson.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 05-02 by unanimous consent.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (3)
Amendment -A6
Adopted (5/24/2017 11:37:55 AM)
Amendment -3
Proposed (4/17/2017 9:03:53 AM)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/18/2017 11:52:22 AM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor