+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On August 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 635, 2017 Laws.
On August 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 1, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 1--Johnson; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Fahey, Marsh, Nearman, Smith G, Speaker Kotek.
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30.
On June 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce, then Ways and Means.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.