+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 279, 2019 Laws.
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 5--Hernandez, Marsh, Meek, Post, Smith Warner; Excused, 1--Greenlick.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hass declared potential conflict of interest.
- Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Winters.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On January 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -3
Adopted (4/9/2019 9:39 AM)
Amendment 3
Proposed (4/8/2019 10:23 AM)