+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 403, 2015 Laws.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Rayfield.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2015 Calendar.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2015 Calendar.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2015 Calendar.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2015 Calendar.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2015 Calendar.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On May 15, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Possible Work Session cancelled.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #5304
4/6/2015 11:15:04 AM
Amendment #5131
4/6/2015 11:15:04 AM
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor