+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On July 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/14/2017 3:44:37 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (4/16/2017 4:00:46 PM)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor