+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, October 8, 2013.
- Chapter 3, 2013 Laws.
On October 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On October 7, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On October 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On October 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 27; nays, 2--Dingfelder, Shields; excused, 1--Prozanski.
- Vote explanation(s) filed by Monnes Anderson.
On October 2, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
- Referred to Special Session.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McLane. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Cameron, Clem, Holvey, Thatcher, Unger.
On October 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
- Work Session held.
On September 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
- Referred to Special Session.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #3011
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Special Session
Type:
Primary Sponsor