+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Education by order of the President.
- Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Education and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Workforce, then Ways and Means.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -4
Adopted (4/4/2019 2:05 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/11/2019 11:40 AM)