+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2022.
- Chapter 417, 2021 Laws.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2021 Calendar.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Housing.
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Heard.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -1
Adopted (4/2/2021 2:40 PM)