+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded and be referred to Rules. Rescinsion denied. Referred to Rules and then Ways and Means by order of the President.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment #1917
Not Adopted
Amendment #1863
Not Adopted
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor