+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On August 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter 784, 2013 Laws.
- Effective date, August 14, 2013.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On July 7, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 60.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Kruse.
- Second reading.
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Ways and Means.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
- Rules suspended. Second reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned to Full Committee.
- Work Session held.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment #1916
Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Environment And Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor