+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective date, May 16, 2013.
- Chapter 188, 2013 Laws.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Gallegos, Gilliam, Johnson.
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Business and Labor.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, George, Steiner Hayward.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and Transportation.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.