+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On July 1, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Close granted unanimous consent to correct record to reflect Aye vote.
- Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett.
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed.Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Whitsett; Excused, 1--Unger; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bailey.
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules by order of Speaker.
- Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Hass,Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 6--Baertschiger, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Olsen, Whitsett; excused, 2--Boquist, Steiner Hayward.
On April 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (10)
Amendment #2873
Adopted
Amendment #2363
Not Adopted
Amendment #2226
Not Adopted
Amendment #2249
Not Adopted
Amendment #2225
Not Adopted
Amendment #2224
Not Adopted
Amendment #2198
Not Adopted
Amendment #2184
Not Adopted
Amendment #2183
Not Adopted
Amendment #1144
Not Adopted