+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 30, 2019 in the House:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Economic Development.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Golden, Heard, Linthicum.
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-17 by unanimous consent.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Business and General Government, then Ways and Means.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (6)
Amendment -A5
Proposed (5/22/2019 8:30 AM)
Amendment -A4
Proposed (5/15/2019 9:44 AM)
Amendment A4
Proposed (5/17/2019 11:06 AM)
Amendment -3
Adopted (3/29/2019 1:54 PM)
Amendment -2
Proposed (3/19/2019 1:34 PM)
Amendment -1
Proposed (3/19/2019 1:34 PM)