+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2016.
- Chapter 587, 2015 Laws.
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barreto, Esquivel, Johnson.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2015 Calendar.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 11, 2015 Calendar.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2015 Calendar.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2015 Calendar.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session held.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Work Session cancelled.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing held.
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Energy and Environment.
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Burdick, Shields, Winters.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 04-29 by unanimous consent.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (4)
Amendment #
4/16/2015 3:37:13 PM
Amendment #5927
4/16/2015 3:37:13 PM
Amendment #5797
4/14/2015 2:01:11 PM
Amendment #5620
4/14/2015 2:01:11 PM
+ − Sponsor
Environment And Natural Resources
Type:
Primary Sponsor