+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2020.
- Chapter 350, 2019 Laws.
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barker, Boles, Clem.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2019 Calendar.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Health Care.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 4--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Hansell, Linthicum, Winters.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Workforce be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care, then Workforce.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendment
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/4/2019 1:07 PM)