+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee upon adjournment.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
- Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Work Session not held.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment -1
Proposed (4/6/2021 7:18 AM)
Amendment -2
Adopted (4/7/2021 11:21 AM)