+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date, January 1, 2018.
- Chapter 194, 2017 Laws.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor signed.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Heard, Williamson.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar.
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar.
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- Second reading.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing and Work Session held.
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On February 27, 2017 in the House:
- First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Dembrow.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Carried over to 02-23 by unanimous consent.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second reading.
- Recommendation: Do pass.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Work Session held.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing held.
On January 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Judiciary.
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.